Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Alessandri

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1836Born
18 Sep 185822.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189660.3AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
5 Jul 189660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
22 Aug 190468.5DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Alessandri
Bishop Dionisio Alessandri (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi, Diocese of Assisi
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Ges¨ a Castro Pretorio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 275
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017