Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roque Antonio Adames Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1928Born
17 Apr 195425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
14 Mar 196637.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
22 May 196637.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
22 Apr 199263.4ResignedBishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
31 Oct 200980.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Roque Antonio Adames Rodríguez (VIAF: 77932482)
Bishop Roque Antonio Adames Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJanico

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018