Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)

Dioecesis Catharensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Ilija Janjić, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10th Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Split-Makarska
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Montenegro
  • Square Kilometers: 674 (260 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Biksupski Ordinarijat, Trg Sv. Tripuna 336, 85330 Kotor, Crna Gora
  • Telephone: (032)322-315
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10th CenturyErectedDiocese of Kotor (Cattaro) (erected)
30 June 1828Territory AddedDiocese of Budua (Budva) (suppressed) Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)
1 August 1932Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Kotor (Cattaro) (from Zadar to Immediately Subject)
27 July 1969Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Kotor (Cattaro) (from Immediately Subject)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195020424023530ap1951
197040,000.0%19423088821ap1971
198011,00040,50027.2%2232544049528ap1981
199012,55047,60026.4%1652159752029ap1991
199910,00090,00011.1%12221248023828ap2000
200010,00090,00011.1%1121376923728ap2001
200110,00070,00014.3%1231566633728ap2002
200210,00050,00020.0%1321566622928ap2003
200310,00050,00020.0%1121376922828ap2004
200410,00050,00020.0%1221471423428ap2005
201310,030111,0009.0%1331662633225ap2014
201611,003105,01210.5%1341764742725ap2017
20198,30095,0008.7%1321555322525ap2020
20218,30095,0008.7%13136382425ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 177
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 142
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192, and Page 193
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 398, to Page 399
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 25, Page 75, to Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 20 Jun 2024