Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Leshan [Kiating]

Dioecesis Chiatimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 27,000 (10,428 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Leshan, Sichuan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yachow
10 July 1929ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin] Prefecture Apostolic of Yachow (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yachow
3 March 1933ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Yachow Vicariate Apostolic of Yachow
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan]
9 February 1938Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Yachow Vicariate Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan]
Diocese of Leshan [Kiating]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan] Diocese of Leshan [Kiating]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Leshan [Kiating]
19502,645,000.0%242401917ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast