Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Vérgez Alzaga, L.C.

Secretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

Titular Archbishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari

President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

Titular See: (Announced 8 Sep; Effective 1 Oct)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1945 Born
25 Dec 196520.8Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
15 Sep 196924.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
26 Nov 196924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
30 Aug 201368.4AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
15 Oct 201368.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
15 Nov 201368.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
8 Sep 202176.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
1 Oct 202176.5AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
1 Oct 202176.5AppointedPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Fernando Vérgez Alzaga
Bishop Fernando Vérgez Alzaga L.C. (born ) Secretary General of Governatorate of Vatican City State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Ordained DeaconMonticchio, Massa Lubrense, Archdiocese of Sorrento, Italy
Ordained PriestNostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Governatorate of Vatican City State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 149
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,982
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2021
  • od/c0: AM, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Oct 2021

Quantcast