Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Farrell, L.C.

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity

Titular Bishop of Abitinae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1944 Born
15 Sep 196925.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
26 Nov 196925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
19 Dec 200258.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abitinae
19 Dec 200258.8AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
6 Jan 200358.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abitinae

MicroData Summary for Brian Farrell (VIAF: 305407254)
Bishop Brian Farrell L.C. (born ) Secretary of Promoting Christian Unity

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained DeaconMonticchio, Massa Lubrense, Archdiocese of Sorrento, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,311
  • c0: AM, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Oct 2021

Quantcast