Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen Pažak, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1946 Born
14 Sep 196519.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Aug 196923.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Aug 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Dec 200054.3AppointedBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
14 Feb 200154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
7 May 201669.7AppointedBishop of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA
7 May 201669.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
20 Jul 201669.9InstalledBishop of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA
15 Sep 201872.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
23 Aug 202175.0RetiredBishop of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stephen Pažak
Bishop John Stephen Pažak C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGary, IN
Ordained BishopTransfiguration, Cathedral, Markham

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,905
  • prof/c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 May 2016
  • i: CB, 22 Jul 2016
  • perp: CB, 1 Jan 2020
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast