Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basil Myron Schott, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1939Born
3 Aug 195818.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
Aug 1959³19.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Aug 196525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Feb 199656.3AppointedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
11 Jul 199656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
3 May 200262.6AppointedArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jul 200262.8InstalledArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
10 Jun 201070.7DiedArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basil Myron Schott
Archbishop Basil Myron Schott O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreeland, PA
Ordained PriestFranciscan, Monastery, New Canaan, CT
Ordained BishopSaint John the Baptist, Cathedral, Parma, Eparchy of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Section, Mount St. Macrina, Cemetery, Uniontown, PA

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,775
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • b: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast