Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Lomanto

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1962 Born
29 Jun 198624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
24 Jul 202058.3AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
24 Oct 202058.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lomanto (VIAF: 250673827)
Archbishop Francesco Lomanto (born ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMussomeli, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Ordained BishopMadonna delle Lacrime, Basilica, Siracusa, Archdiocese of Siracusa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siracusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Aug 2020
  • c34: CB, 16 Oct 2020
  • c4: CB, 23 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,532
  • c1: AM, 2 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast