Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyrille Jean Zohrabian, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Acilisene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1881BornErzerum
12 May 190422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Aug 194059.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
29 Aug 194059.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Acilisene
27 Oct 194059.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acilisene
1954¹72.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
20 Sep 197291.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyrille Jean Zohrabian:
Bishop Cyrille Jean Zohrabian O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cilicia

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015