Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giovanni Zanardi

Deceased

Bishop of Guastalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1766BornFontevivo
6 Jun 178923.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183670.5AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
12 Feb 183770.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
15 Sep 1854³88.4DiedBishop of Guastalla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giovanni Zanardi:
Bishop Pietro Giovanni Zanardi (born , died ) Bishop of Guastalla

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,309
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013