Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Ferdinand Vitte, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1824Born
1846¹21.1ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
184722.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
4 Apr 187348.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Apr 187348.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
4 May 187348.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
15 Jan 188055.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
9 Dec 188359.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Ferdinand Vitte
Bishop Pierre-Ferdinand Vitte S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCormoz, France
Ordained BishopNotre Dame du Verdelais, Gironde

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017