Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Vinati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bosa, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1847Born
16 Jan 190658.5AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
16 Jan 190658.5AppointedAdministrator of Alghero, Italy
25 Mar 190658.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
May 1907³59.8ResignedAdministrator of Alghero, Italy
31 Jul 191669.1ResignedBishop of Bosa, Italy
31 Jul 191669.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
9 Jan 191769.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Vinati
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Vinati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 46, and Page 90
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,906, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast