Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesar Gerardo Maria Vielmo Guerra, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile

Titular Bishop of Ariassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1914Born
27 Jul 193117.5EnteredMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
28 Jul 193218.5Simple VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
13 Oct 193521.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
22 Aug 193723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Dec 195945.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
19 Dec 195945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ariassus
7 Feb 196046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ariassus
5 Jun 196046.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
16 Jun 196349.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile

MicroData Summary for Cesar Gerardo Maria Vielmo Guerra
Bishop Cesar Gerardo Maria Vielmo Guerra O.S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Aysén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello di Godego, Italy
Ordained PriestMonte Berico, Basilica, Vicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 5
  • c1/vows: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017