Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo Vido

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1847BornCumaro
9 Mar 191568.2AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
9 Mar 191568.2AppointedBishop of Mykonos, Greece
Jun 1915³68.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
3 Jul 191972.5AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
18 Sep 192477.7DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Vido:
Archbishop Matteo Vido (born , died ) Archbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 267, and Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013