Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mauricio Vélez García

Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Lapda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1964 Born
5 Dec 199228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
17 Jan 201752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
17 Jan 201752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lapda
25 Feb 201752.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lapda

MicroData Summary for José Mauricio Vélez García
Bishop José Mauricio Vélez García (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopCathedral, Medellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Medellín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 24 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017