Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NikollŽ Troshani

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo)

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1915BornTroshan
8 Mar 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 195842.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania
18 Apr 195842.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
25 Mar 195943.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
199175.6RetiredApostolic Administrator of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania
25 May 199479.0DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania

MicroData Summary for NikollŽ Troshani:
Bishop NikollŽ Troshani (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of DurrŽs (Durazzo)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,581
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,751
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 833
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1959, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013