Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Louis-Joseph-Constantin Tournier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore

Titular Bishop of Ipsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1887BornBuc, France
2 Mar 191224.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Jan 193244.4AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
13 Apr 193244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbatore, India
Jan 1938³50.3ResignedBishop of Coimbatore, India
Jan 1938³50.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipsus
18 May 193850.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbatore, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Louis-Joseph-Constantin Tournier:
Bishop Marie-Louis-Joseph-Constantin Tournier M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013