Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin Szabó (Sabov, Savov)

Deceased

Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1926Born
7 Nov 195630.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 197751.5Ordained BishopAdministrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Nov 198256.8DiedAdministrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Constantin Szabó (Sabov, Savov)
Bishop Constantin Szabó (Sabov, Savov) (born , died ) Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzémerke

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,949
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018