Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Theodorus Suwatan, M.S.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Manado, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1940 Born
8 Jan 196928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
8 Feb 199049.8AppointedBishop of Manado, Indonesia
29 Jun 199050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Manado, Indonesia
12 Apr 201777.0RetiredBishop of Manado, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Theodorus Suwatan (VIAF: 284672852)
Bishop Joseph Theodorus Suwatan M.S.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Manado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,071
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017