Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Casimir Libère de Stockem

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

Titular Bishop of Canopus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1767³BornLiege
9 Apr 179124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
18 Jun 179124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
3 Dec 179225.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Dec 179225.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
12 May 179326.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
27 Aug 181144.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Casimir Libère de Stockem
Bishop Antoine Casimir Libère de Stockem (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016