Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Soggiu

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1803Born
23 Dec 182623.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187167.9AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
4 Feb 187268.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
5 Apr 187874.3DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Soggiu (VIAF: 89512458)
Archbishop Antonio Soggiu (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGhilarza, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017