Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Su Haw Chiu

Bishop Emeritus of Sibu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1939 BornSibu
4 Dec 196930.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 198647.6AppointedBishop of Sibu, Malaysia
6 Jan 198747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sibu, Malaysia
24 Dec 201172.6ResignedBishop of Sibu, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Dominic Su Haw Chiu:
Bishop Dominic Su Haw Chiu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sibu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sibu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013