Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Dotu Sekey

Deceased

Bishop of Gbarnga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1940BornAccra, Ghana
20 Aug 196727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Palmas, Liberia
17 Nov 198646.3AppointedBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia
6 Jan 198746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia
13 Dec 200060.3DiedBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Benedict Dotu Sekey:
Bishop Benedict Dotu Sekey (born , died ) Bishop of Gbarnga

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013