Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Sastre

Deceased

Bishop of Lokossa, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1926Born
21 Dec 195226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lokossa, Benin
2 Mar 197245.7AppointedBishop of Lokossa, Benin
6 Aug 197246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lokossa, Benin
16 Jan 200073.6DiedBishop of Lokossa, Benin

MicroData Summary for Robert Sastre
Bishop Robert Sastre (born , died ) Bishop of Lokossa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand-Popo

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018