Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Sálac

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Baliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1908Born
26 Jun 193224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Jun 197062.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Jun 197062.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
19 Jul 197062.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
19 Dec 197567.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Sálac
Bishop Josip Sálac (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaruvar
Ordained BishopZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast