Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Léon Rojas Chaparro

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1917Born
4 Apr 194224.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
24 Aug 196144.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
24 Aug 196144.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
1 Oct 196144.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capitolias
13 Dec 196144.4SucceededBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
11 Jun 198264.8DiedBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Léon Rojas Chaparro
Bishop José Léon Rojas Chaparro (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQueniquea

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018