Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (III)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1613BornMünster
29 Sep 164330.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Mar 164430.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Oct 164633.0SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
22 Aug 165036.9ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
22 Dec 165037.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
14 Aug 167258.9DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Adrian von Riedmatten (III):
Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (III) (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013