Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Riberi, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1640³BornFronteira
17 Mar 166827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
12 Nov 169151.2AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
18 Nov 169151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
8 Dec 170262.3DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Riberi:
Bishop Bartolomeo Riberi O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015