Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Rhéaume, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Timmins, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1873BornLévis
2 Apr 190430.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Jun 192349.5AppointedBishop of Haileybury, Ontario, Canada
18 Oct 192349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Haileybury, Ontario, Canada
8 May 195581.5DiedBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis Rhéaume:
Bishop Louis Rhéaume O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Timmins

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013