Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyril Edward Restieaux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1910Born
1 Nov 193222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 195545.1AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 195545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 198575.7RetiredBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 199686.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Cyril Edward Restieaux
Bishop Cyril Edward Restieaux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorwich, Norfolk, Diocese of Northampton, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSts. Mary and Boniface, Cathedral, Plymouth, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Death PlaceStoodley Knowle, Convent, Torquay, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Sts. Mary and Boniface, Cathedral, Plymouth, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 45
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 174
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 29 Mar 2018