Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian (Jobby) Pozholiparampil

Bishop of Hosur (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1957 Born
22 Dec 198225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabar), India
10 Oct 201760.1AppointedBishop of Hosur (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Nov 201760.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hosur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian (Jobby) Pozholiparampil
Bishop Sebastian (Jobby) Pozholiparampil (born ) Bishop of Hosur

EventPlace
Birth PlacePullur
Ordained BishopSt. Anthony's, Church, Noothenchery

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Hosur (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2017
  • ob: CB, 24 Oct 2017
  • c2+: CB, 11 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Aug 2018

Quantcast