Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Anselmo Polanco y Fontecha, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1881BornBuenavista de Valdavia
17 Dec 190423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
21 Jun 193554.1AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
24 Aug 193554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
7 Feb 193957.8DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
1 Oct 1995Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Anselmo Polanco y Fontecha:
Bishop Bl. Anselmo Polanco y Fontecha O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 66
  • op: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015