Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Pizzi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1855BornMiranda
27 Aug 190752.5AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
15 Sep 190752.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
5 Nov 191257.7AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
1 Feb 191358.0InstalledBishop of San Severo, Italy
16 Jun 192166.3DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Pizzi:
Bishop Gaetano Pizzi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 219
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013