Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Władysław Pieronek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sosnowiec, Poland

Titular Bishop of Cufruta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1934Born
1956²21.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
26 Oct 195723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 Mar 199257.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
25 Mar 199257.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cufruta
26 Apr 199257.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cufruta
31 Aug 199863.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
27 Dec 201884.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sosnowiec, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Władysław Pieronek
Bishop Tadeusz Władysław Pieronek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sosnowiec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadziechowy
Ordained PriestSt. Michael and St. Stanislaus, Basilica, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Peter and Paul, Church, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 877
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,674
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: CB, 27 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast