Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pibul Visitnondachai

Bishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1946 Born
17 Mar 197427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bangkok, Thailand
19 Jun 200963.0AppointedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
12 Sep 200963.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pibul Visitnondachai
Bishop Joseph Pibul Visitnondachai (born ) Bishop of Nakhon Sawan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBang Buathong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nakhon Sawan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast