Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Pecci

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1776BornGubbio
23 Mar 179922.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 183963.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
8 Dec 183963.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
1 Mar 184164.9AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
30 Sep 185074.5Elevated to Cardinal
3 Oct 185074.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
21 Jan 185578.8DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pecci:
Cardinal Giuseppe Pecci (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013