Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierfranco Pastore

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

Titular Bishop of Forontoniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1927BornVarallo Sesia, Italy
25 Jun 195023.1Ordained PriestPriest
198456.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
3 Dec 199467.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forontoniana
6 Jan 199567.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forontoniana
29 Nov 200376.6RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
30 Aug 201588.3DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

MicroData Summary for Pierfranco Pastore:
Bishop Pierfranco Pastore (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Social Communications

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,462
  • d: CB, 31 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015