Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Claudio Palumbo

Bishop-Elect of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1965 Born
15 Aug 199025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
5 Jun 201752.3AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
8 Sep 201752.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
23 Sep 201752.6InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Palumbo
Father Claudio Palumbo (born ) Bishop-Elect of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenafro, Diocese of Isernia e Venafro
Ordained BishopSan Giuseppe Lavoratore, Church, Isernia, Diocese of Isernia-Venafro

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Trivento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 5 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jun 2017