Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Pagendorfer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1557AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
24 Mar 1557AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
25 Jul 1558Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
15 Jul 1561DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Pagendorfer
Bishop Erasmus Pagendorfer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Maria am Gestade, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast