Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Padoin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1930Born
9 Apr 195524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
8 May 199363.0AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
26 Jun 199363.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
2 Sep 200575.3RetiredBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
31 Oct 201989.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvio Padoin
Bishop Silvio Padoin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePieve di Soligo, Diocese of Ceneda
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Assunta, Church, Pieve di Soligo, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
Ordained BishopMonterusciello, Diocese of Pozzuoli
Death PlaceOspedale Civile, Conegliano, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
Buried Place (Original)Priests’ Chapel, Cemetery, Pieve di Soligo, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,115
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d/loc: CB, 31 Oct 2019
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast