Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Pacifici, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1857Born
29 Aug 188023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
28 Aug 191255.3AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
27 Oct 191255.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
9 Jan 191355.6InstalledArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
7 Apr 193476.9DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pacifici
Archbishop Pietro Pacifici C.R.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSupino

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,935
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast