Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janusz Ostrowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia, Poland

Titular Bishop of Caltadria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1964 Born
25 May 199126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia, Poland
27 Feb 201853.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia, Poland
27 Feb 201853.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caltadria
21 Apr 201853.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caltadria

MicroData Summary for Janusz Ostrowski
Bishop Janusz Ostrowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlsztyn, Archdiocese of Warmia
Ordained BishopSw. Jakub, Cathedral, Olsztyn, Archdiocese of Warmia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Warmia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast