Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Nicolosi

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1838Born
5 May 188546.8AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
6 Jul 188547.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
6 Jun 189051.9AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
25 Jan 191677.5DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Nicolosi
Bishop Dionisio Nicolosi (born , died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZante, Diocese of Cefalonia e Zante
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017