Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard James Murphy, C. R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1918Born
3 Jun 194425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
12 Jun 196748.4AppointedBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
1 Sep 196748.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
22 May 197455.4DiedBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Bernard James Murphy
Bishop Bernard James Murphy C. R. (born , died ) Bishop of Hamilton in Bermuda

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreston, Canada

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018