Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Massarenghi

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornNapoli
28 Mar 167846.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
24 Apr 167846.3Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
29 Sep 168452.7DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Massarenghi:
Bishop Andrea Massarenghi (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015