Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislao Mossa

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1765Born
24 Mar 179226.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 182357.5SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
24 Nov 182357.9ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
13 Jun 182458.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
9 Apr 182559.3DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Mossa
Bishop Stanislao Mossa (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1824
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 May 2020

Quantcast