Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Morvan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1922BornLe Saint, France
26 Jun 194927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1 Mar 197351.1AppointedBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
29 Jun 197351.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
199875.9ResignedBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
25 Oct 199876.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Morvan:
Bishop François-Marie Morvan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna)

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013