Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Morta Figuls

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Gubaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1914Born
13 Mar 193722.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 196550.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
19 Jan 196550.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
19 Mar 196550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
21 Jun 197258.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Angel Morta Figuls
Bishop Angel Morta Figuls (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmetlla de Merola

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018