Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dino Cardinal Monduzzi

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

Cardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1922BornBrisighella, Italy
22 Jul 194523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
18 Dec 198664.7AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
18 Dec 198664.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Capreae
6 Jan 198764.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capreae
7 Feb 199875.8RetiredPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
21 Feb 199875.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199875.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
18 Apr 199876.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
13 Oct 200684.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

MicroData Summary for Dino Monduzzi:
Cardinal Dino Monduzzi (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Prefecture of the Papal Household

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2006
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 1998
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013